TN SB0822 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 168
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 168
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes all records pertaining to licensure or registration by owners of security systems held or kept by a governmental entity confidential; includes all information, photos, presentations, schematics and surveys. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.
Title
As enacted, makes all records pertaining to licensure or registration by owners of security systems held or kept by a governmental entity confidential; includes all information, photos, presentations, schematics and surveys. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 168 | |
2011-04-18 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-18 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/18/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0424 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 168