TN SB0815 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits state employees from lobbying for 12 months following departure from office or employment. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, prohibits state employees from lobbying for 12 months following departure from office or employment. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0394 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee