TN SB0810 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, makes various changes concerning the prescription of certain Scheduled controlled substances. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10, Part 3; Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, makes various changes concerning the prescription of certain Scheduled controlled substances. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10, Part 3; Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15 Pub. Ch. 124
2019-04-15 Effective date(s) 04/09/2019; 07/01/2019
2019-04-09SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-02SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-01HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-03-28SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-03-28SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-03-28HousePassed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-03-28HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0035)
2019-03-28HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-03-25HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-21SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 1
2019-03-21SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0110)
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-18SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
2019-03-13SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0843 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 124

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback