TN SB0807 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the commissioner of human services to designate a specific departmental staff person to serve, in addition to the staff person's other duties, as a liaison to provide an official, uniform message to child care providers, community stakeholders, department child care staff, and partner agencies, using all appropriate channels of communication. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 3, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, Chapter 3, Part 5, relative to child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 406 | |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0670 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/12/2021