TN SB0807 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, exempts from licensure requirements person providing direct care services to no more than three people receiving services through consumer direction in a medicaid home- and community-based services program. - Amends TCA Section 33-2-402 and Section 33-2-403.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, exempts from licensure requirements person providing direct care services to no more than three people receiving services through consumer direction in a medicaid home- and community-based services program. - Amends TCA Section 33-2-402 and Section 33-2-403.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09 Pub. Ch. 89
2019-04-09 Effective date(s) 04/04/2019
2019-04-04SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-03-28SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-03-27HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-03-21SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-03-15SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-03-14HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-03-14HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0036)
2019-03-14HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-03-04HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-02-28SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-02-28SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0038)
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/28/2019
2019-02-25SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 2/28/2019
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019
2019-02-20SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/20/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0951 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 89

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback