TN SB0803 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires, instead of authorizes, the Tennessee school safety center to establish school safety grants to assist LEAs in funding programs that address school safety; establishes requirements for school safety grant applications and eligibility; requires the Tennessee school safety center to reserve funds for, and give priority in awarding school safety grants to, LEAs with schools that did not have a full-time school resource officer during the 2018-2019 school year. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-1004 and Section 49-6-4302.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires, instead of authorizes, the Tennessee school safety center to establish school safety grants to assist LEAs in funding programs that address school safety; establishes requirements for school safety grant applications and eligibility; requires the Tennessee school safety center to reserve funds for, and give priority in awarding school safety grants to, LEAs with schools that did not have a full-time school resource officer during the 2018-2019 school year. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-1004 and Section 49-6-4302.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24 Pub. Ch. 154
2019-04-24 Effective date(s) 04/18/2019
2019-04-18SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-09SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-08SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-04SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-04HousePassed H., Ayes 97, Nays 1, PNV 0
2019-04-04HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0148)
2019-04-04HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0078)
2019-04-04HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-04SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0, PNV 2
2019-04-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0144)
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019
2019-04-02SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2019
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0947 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 154

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback