TN SB0799 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reinstates service credits and salary increases that were suspended during 2009-2010 for assistant public defenders and assistant district attorneys. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14, Part 1 and Title 8, Chapter 7, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, reinstates service credits and salary increases that were suspended during 2009-2010 for assistant public defenders and assistant district attorneys. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14, Part 1 and Title 8, Chapter 7, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-15HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-15SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-11HousePassed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-11HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-01HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-28SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
2019-03-26SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-03-05SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0943 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-11 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback