TN SB0798 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits members of the general assembly from bidding on, selling, or offering for sale any service to a state entity or to have a financial interest in the bidding, selling, or offering for sale of any service to a state entity; makes the prohibition applicable during the tenure of the member's office and for six months thereafter; creates certain exceptions; violation results in disqualification from holding certain offices; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9 and Title 12.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9 and Title 12, relative to services provided to the state by state officials and employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 347 | |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1040 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021