TN SB0798 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases the penalty to a Class B felony for 15 grams or more or a Class A felony for 150 grams or more of fentanyl, carfentanil, remifentanil, alfentanil, thiafentanil, or any fentanyl derivative or analogue. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases the penalty to a Class B felony for 15 grams or more or a Class A felony for 150 grams or more of fentanyl, carfentanil, remifentanil, alfentanil, thiafentanil, or any fentanyl derivative or analogue. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-17HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-17SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-17SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-15SenateConcurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0235)
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-10HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-10HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0235)
2019-04-10HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-01HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-28SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
2019-03-26SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-03-05SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0942 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback