TN SB0797 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a court to find adequate provision for the settlement of child custody and support, property rights, and apportionment of debts before granting any marital dissolution agreement, marital separation agreement, or agreed permanent parenting plan, in addition to divorce. - Amends TCA Section 36-4-103.
Title
As introduced, requires a court to find adequate provision for the settlement of child custody and support, property rights, and apportionment of debts before granting any marital dissolution agreement, marital separation agreement, or agreed permanent parenting plan, in addition to divorce. - Amends TCA Section 36-4-103.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0599 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-12 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0797&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0797.pdf |