TN SB0796 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the use of campaign funds for the child care expenditures of a candidate that are incurred by the candidate as a direct result of the candidate's participation in campaign-related events and activities. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10; Title 3 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 10; Title 3 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 5, relative to campaign finances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/6/2024 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0751 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee