TN SB0796 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Public Charter Schools Act of 2002; creates public charter school commission. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Public Charter Schools Act of 2002; creates public charter school commission. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 219 | |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0940 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 219