TN SB0795 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Education Savings Account Pilot Program." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Education Savings Account Pilot Program." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 5 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage with amendment, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage with amendment, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 506 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 5 PNV 0 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0939 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 506