TN SB0790 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the board of dentistry's annual reporting requirements to make the board's annual report to the governor due no later than September 1. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, revises the board of dentistry's annual reporting requirements to make the board's annual report to the governor due no later than September 1. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/10/2017 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Reset on last calendar of 2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/6/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0667 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Held on desk.