TN SB0786 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows private entity to provide a roll off construction or demolition debris container to a person requesting such container even if the site is located in a municipality that has granted an exclusive franchise to itself for the collection, removal and disposal of solid waste. - Amends TCA Title 6 and Title 68, Chapter 211.
Title
As introduced, allows private entity to provide a roll off construction or demolition debris container to a person requesting such container even if the site is located in a municipality that has granted an exclusive franchise to itself for the collection, removal and disposal of solid waste. - Amends TCA Title 6 and Title 68, Chapter 211.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - S. E,A&NR COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - S. E,A&NR COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/18/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on S. E,A&NR Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0642 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-09 - Failed In: Local Government Committee