TN SB0785 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes department of revenue to suspend or revoke the registration, license plate, permit, or certificate of title issued to any vehicle assigned to a motor carrier that has been prohibited from operating by the federal motor carrier safety administration; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes department of revenue to suspend or revoke the registration, license plate, permit, or certificate of title issued to any vehicle assigned to a motor carrier that has been prohibited from operating by the federal motor carrier safety administration; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09 Pub. Ch. 70
2019-04-09 Effective date(s) 10/01/2019
2019-03-28SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-03-22SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-03-20HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-03-20SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-03-19SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-03-18HousePassed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 5
2019-03-18HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-02-28HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-02-26SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-02-25SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019
2019-02-20SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/20/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0929 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 70

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback