TN SB0783 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes authorization and procedures for housing authorities to redevelop certain areas for transit projects. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 23; Title 13, Chapter 20 and Title 29, Chapter 17.
Title
As enacted, establishes authorization and procedures for housing authorities to redevelop certain areas for transit projects. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 23; Title 13, Chapter 20 and Title 29, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 254 | |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/11/17 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S&L Govt. Comm. 3-7-17 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1384 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 254