TN SB0779 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, converts the department's construction manager/general contractor services (CM/GC) pilot program into a fully authorized project delivery method; establishes limitations for CM/GC contracts. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, converts the department's construction manager/general contractor services (CM/GC) pilot program into a fully authorized project delivery method; establishes limitations for CM/GC contracts. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Pub. Ch. 106 | |
2019-04-15 | Effective date(s) 04/11/2019 | |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0167) |
2019-04-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0182) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0923 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 106