TN SB0778 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021,07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021,07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides annual $600 cash supplements to volunteer firefighters who successfully complete in each year an in-service training course. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 24, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 24, Part 2, relative to volunteer firefighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Effective date(s) 05/18/2021,07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-21 | Pub. Ch. 478 | |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-05-03 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0189) |
2021-05-03 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0266) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0772 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 478