TN SB0778 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a court to automatically dismiss a misdemeanor charge if a final verdict has not been rendered within three years of the offense and the defendant is not charged with any subsequent offenses during the three-year period; requires the automatic expunction of a nonviolent misdemeanor charge or conviction if the defendant is not charged with any subsequent offenses within three years of the initial charge. - Amends TCA Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires a court to automatically dismiss a misdemeanor charge if a final verdict has not been rendered within three years of the offense and the defendant is not charged with any subsequent offenses during the three-year period; requires the automatic expunction of a nonviolent misdemeanor charge or conviction if the defendant is not charged with any subsequent offenses within three years of the initial charge. - Amends TCA Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-09SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0266 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback