TN SB0776 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Memphis sands aquifer regional management board. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 69.
Title
As introduced, creates the Memphis sands aquifer regional management board. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 69.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0816 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee