TN SB0772 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 477
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions regarding the aviation fuel tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to aviation fuel taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21 Pub. Ch. 477
2021-05-21 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-05-18SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-11SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-07HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-05SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-05SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-05-03HousePassed H., Ayes 87, Nays 3, PNV 1
2021-05-03HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0417)
2021-05-03HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-05-03SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-05-03SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 3
2021-05-03SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0429)
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 0
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-21SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2021
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/21/2021
2021-04-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/21/2021
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
2021-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2021
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-04-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2021
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation, as amended
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-02-23SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0773 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 477

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback