TN SB0771 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Failed in Senate Education Committee (no motion)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires students in public schools and public institutions of higher education to use restrooms and locker rooms that are assigned to persons of the same sex as that shown on the students' birth certificates. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires students in public schools and public institutions of higher education to use restrooms and locker rooms that are assigned to persons of the same sex as that shown on the students' birth certificates. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22SenateFailed in Senate Education Committee (no motion)
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/22/2017
2017-03-15SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-08SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/22/2017
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/8/2017
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0888 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-30 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback