TN SB0768 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Reentry Success Act of 2021". - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 12; Title 40; Title 41, Chapter 4; Title 41, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 11; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 55, Chapter 50 and Section 62-76-104.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 12; Title 40; Title 41, Chapter 4; Title 41, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 11; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 55, Chapter 50 and Section 62-76-104, relative to offender reentry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 410
2021-04-28SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-04-28SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0402)
2021-04-28SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0254)
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-26SenateRules Suspended, to be heard on Senate Regular Calendar 4-28-21
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 1
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
2021-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2021
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-04-06SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-03-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-17SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/23/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0785 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 410

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback