TN SB0768 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines "capitalization rate" for greenbelt purposes as the average lending rate for agricultural land based on the most recent survey by the state board of equalization of lenders at the time of the calculation. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 10.
Title
As introduced, defines "capitalization rate" for greenbelt purposes as the average lending rate for agricultural land based on the most recent survey by the state board of equalization of lenders at the time of the calculation. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0655 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0768&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0768.pdf |