TN SB0768 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/29/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/29/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires traffic signals located in intersections employing surveillance cameras for traffic safety to use minimum exposure time of five seconds for yellow light while maintaining three second minimum yellow light for other traffic signals. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, requires traffic signals located in intersections employing surveillance cameras for traffic safety to use minimum exposure time of five seconds for yellow light while maintaining three second minimum yellow light for other traffic signals. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/21/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/14/2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm. | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0541 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-13 - Action Def. in Transportation Committee to Summer Study
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0768&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0768.pdf |