TN SB0766 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, in Davidson County, requires that tree density be considered as a factor in determining the value of residential property. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, in Davidson County, requires that tree density be considered as a factor in determining the value of residential property. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0582 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee