TN SB0765 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2019
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, decreases from 60 to 40 years the age at which a disabled person with no family member or other person, bank, or corporation willing and able to serve as conservator may be appointed a district public guardian. - Amends TCA Title 34, Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, decreases from 60 to 40 years the age at which a disabled person with no family member or other person, bank, or corporation willing and able to serve as conservator may be appointed a district public guardian. - Amends TCA Title 34, Chapter 7.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2019
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/26/2019
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/19/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0994 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback