TN SB0764 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Mar 20 @ 2:30 pm in Cordell Hull Building
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases from one to two the number of additional dual enrollment courses a student may take under a dual enrollment grant under certain circumstances; allows an eligible student to receive a dual enrollment grant for no more than 10 courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases from one to two the number of additional dual enrollment courses a student may take under a dual enrollment grant under certain circumstances; allows an eligible student to receive a dual enrollment grant for no more than 10 courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2019
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
2019-02-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/13/2019
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/20/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1425 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Def. to Lottery Calendar

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback