TN SB0763 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts official Tennessee state flags and flags of the United States from the sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3, relative to sales and use taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
2024-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024
2023-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2023
2023-02-28SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee with negative recommendation
2023-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/28/2023
2023-02-21SenateAction deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 2/28/2023
2023-02-16SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-02-14SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/21/2023
2023-02-14SenateRefer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0868 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback