TN SB0763 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires a degree-granting postsecondary educational institution to designate a staff member to serve as a homeless-student liaison to assist homeless students who are enrolled in the institution, and to develop a plan to provide homeless students who are enrolled in the institution access to housing resources, if the institution offers housing resources. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires a degree-granting postsecondary educational institution to designate a staff member to serve as a homeless-student liaison to assist homeless students who are enrolled in the institution, and to develop a plan to provide homeless students who are enrolled in the institution access to housing resources, if the institution offers housing resources. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Pub. Ch. 266
2019-05-09 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
2019-04-30SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-23SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-22SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-18HousePassed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 4
2019-04-18HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0253)
2019-04-18HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-03-14HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-12SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-11SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2019-03-11SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0082)
2019-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019
2019-03-06SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1000 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 266

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback