TN SB0759 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires agencies to ensure the provision of appropriate accommodations in accordance with the Americans with Disabilities Act, if the agency requires a person applying for a license to engage in an occupation, trade, or profession in this state to take an examination; not applicable to an examination mandated and administered pursuant to federal law. - Amends TCA Title 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires agencies to ensure the provision of appropriate accommodations in accordance with the Americans with Disabilities Act, if the agency requires a person applying for a license to engage in an occupation, trade, or profession in this state to take an examination; not applicable to an examination mandated and administered pursuant to federal law. - Amends TCA Title 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 243
2019-04-17SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/10/2019
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2019
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0252 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 243

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback