TN SB0759 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Pub. Ch. 456
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Pub. Ch. 456
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that in certain circumstances real property in Shelby County owned and used by certain nonprofit economic or charitable development organizations will be eligible for property tax exemption as a charitable use of property if the real property is owned by a 501(c)(3) nonprofit entity that is engaged in economic development. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, specifies that in certain circumstances real property in Shelby County owned and used by certain nonprofit economic or charitable development organizations will be eligible for property tax exemption as a charitable use of property if the real property is owned by a 501(c)(3) nonprofit entity that is engaged in economic development. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Pub. Ch. 456 | |
2015-05-26 | Effective date(s) 05/18/2015 | |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0243) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 4 calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0243) |
2015-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-09 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0270) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/8/2015 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0708 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 456