TN SB0758 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits certain health benefit plans that provide coverage for cancer therapy from holding proton radiation therapy to a higher standard of clinical evidence for medical policy benefit coverage decisions than the health plan requires for coverage of any other radiation therapy treatment. - Amends TCA Title 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits certain health benefit plans that provide coverage for cancer therapy from holding proton radiation therapy to a higher standard of clinical evidence for medical policy benefit coverage decisions than the health plan requires for coverage of any other radiation therapy treatment. - Amends TCA Title 56.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2017-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
2017-04-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017
2017-03-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-23SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017
2017-02-14SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0899 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback