TN SB0756 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, for any FDA-approved procedure or treatment that is selected by an insured but not covered in the insured's health benefit plan, requires an insurer to pay up to the maximum amount provided in the health benefit plan for an alternative covered procedure or treatment for the same underlying health issue. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As introduced, for any FDA-approved procedure or treatment that is selected by an insured but not covered in the insured's health benefit plan, requires an insurer to pay up to the maximum amount provided in the health benefit plan for an alternative covered procedure or treatment for the same underlying health issue. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0897 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-17 - Sponsor change.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0756&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/SB0756.pdf |