TN SB0754 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes state employment protections for members of the national guard, state guard, and civil air patrol called to active state duty equivalent to the federal Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act of 1994 (USERRA) for members of the national guard called to federal active service. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 33.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 33, relative to employment protections for members of the Tennessee national guard, Tennessee state guard, and civil air patrol.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 284 | |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0082 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021