TN SB0754 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases from $10,000 to $25,000 the civil penalty amount per violation that the attorney general and reporter may recover in an action against a person who commits the offense of caller identification spoofing; clarifies that each call received by a subscriber wherein the caller identification information is misleading or inaccurate constitutes a separate violation for purposes of imposing the civil penalty. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 65.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases from $10,000 to $25,000 the civil penalty amount per violation that the attorney general and reporter may recover in an action against a person who commits the offense of caller identification spoofing; clarifies that each call received by a subscriber wherein the caller identification information is misleading or inaccurate constitutes a separate violation for purposes of imposing the civil penalty. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 65.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019
2019-04-02SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1245 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback