TN SB0748 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes various changes to the controlled substance monitoring database. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 53, Chapter 10, Part 3, relative to the controlled substance monitoring database.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-04-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-04-05HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-03-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-03-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-03-22HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-03-22HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-03-18HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-03-15SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-15SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2021-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021
2021-03-10SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/10/2021
2021-03-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/10/2021
2021-02-24SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/3/2021
2021-02-12SenateRefer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2021-02-12SenateRecalled from Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0080 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-22 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback