TN SB0748 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, raises the penalty for criminal impersonation of a law enforcement officer from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class D felony; imposes a minimum fine of $2,500 if the offense occurred while operating a motor vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, raises the penalty for criminal impersonation of a law enforcement officer from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class D felony; imposes a minimum fine of $2,500 if the offense occurred while operating a motor vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-02SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1250 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback