TN SB0747 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 477
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 477
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the requirements for the operation of horse drawn vehicles on state highways. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, changes the requirements for the operation of horse drawn vehicles on state highways. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 477 | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1252 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 477