TN SB0743 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a department, institution, office, or agency of the state to enter into an agreement with a third party to collect state funds on its behalf under which the third party is permitted to deduct its service fee from the funds collected prior to deposit when such agreement is approved in accordance with present law governing procurement; requires the chief procurement officer to file an annual report listing such approved contracts with the chairs of the finance, ways and means committees of the house and senate. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-301.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 9-4-301, relative to the deposit of state funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 172 | |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0076 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021