TN SB0741 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the commissioner to commission environmental investigative enforcement officers; specifies circumstances under which park rangers and other law enforcement officers within the department may operate outside parks and other specific areas. - Amends TCA Section 11-1-101; Section 11-3-107; Section 59-8-404 and Section 59-8-308.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 11-1-101; Section 11-3-107; Section 59-8-404 and Section 59-8-308, relative to law enforcement employees of the department of environment and conservation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage with amendments , ref to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage with amendments , ref to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Effective date(s) 04/13/2021 | |
2021-04-21 | Pub. Ch. 135 | |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0029) |
2021-03-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 1 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0026) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/2/21 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2021 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0089 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 135