TN SB0740 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, increases from 20 to 30 years the amount of time within which loans from the drinking water revolving loan fund must be amortized; increases from 30 to 40 years the time within which such loans must be amortized when made to disadvantaged communities. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 221, Part 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 221, Part 12, relative to the drinking water revolving loan fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 79
2021-03-15SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021
2021-03-10SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-03SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/10/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0091 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 79

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback