TN SB0738 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, raises the minimum age from 18 to 21 to purchase any tobacco or vapor products; creates a Class C misdemeanor of selling or distributing flavored electronic cigarettes; increases the tax rate on cigarettes by 1.25 cents per cigarette. - Amends TCA Section 1-3-113; Title 39 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 10.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, raises the minimum age from 18 to 21 to purchase any tobacco or vapor products; creates a Class C misdemeanor of selling or distributing flavored electronic cigarettes; increases the tax rate on cigarettes by 1.25 cents per cigarette. - Amends TCA Section 1-3-113; Title 39 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 10.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-02-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to last calendar
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1419 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Failed in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback