TN SB0737 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds "advertising services for the provision of a motor vehicle warranty in a deceptive manner likely to cause the owner to believe that the advertisement originated from the original manufacturer of the motor vehicle or from the dealer that sold the motor vehicle" as a violation of the Consumer Protection Act of 1977. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 55.
Title
As enacted, adds "advertising services for the provision of a motor vehicle warranty in a deceptive manner likely to cause the owner to believe that the advertisement originated from the original manufacturer of the motor vehicle or from the dealer that sold the motor vehicle" as a violation of the Consumer Protection Act of 1977. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Pub. Ch. 25 | |
2017-04-04 | Effective date(s) 03/29/2017 | |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-16 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/21/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0726 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 25