TN SB0734 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases the time the department shall have to notify the victim witness coordinator of the county of conviction of a scheduled parole hearing date when the inmate will be eligible for parole consideration from within 90 days of receipt of a judgment of conviction to within 120 days of such receipt. - Amends TCA Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, relative to criminal procedure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0070 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-13 - Caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback