TN SB0733 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 177
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 177
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires county election commissions to notify the secretary of state's division of elections prior to implementing an Internet electronic filing process. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As enacted, requires county election commissions to notify the secretary of state's division of elections prior to implementing an Internet electronic filing process. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 177 | |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/2/2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0817 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 177