TN SB0732 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, specifies that the receipt required to be furnished by a professional bondsman to any person who transacts business with the bondsman may be written or electronic. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, specifies that the receipt required to be furnished by a professional bondsman to any person who transacts business with the bondsman may be written or electronic. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-02-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2019
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1130 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback