TN SB0732 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of C,L&A Comm
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of C,L&A Comm
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes City of East Ridge to sell at retail Class C common fireworks; the provisions of title 68, chapter 104, part 1 regulating fireworks apply to such sales.
Title
As introduced, authorizes City of East Ridge to sell at retail Class C common fireworks; the provisions of title 68, chapter 104, part 1 regulating fireworks apply to such sales.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of C,L&A Comm | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0272 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-31 - Failed In s/c Industrial Impact of COM of Commerce Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0732&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0732.pdf |