TN SB0727 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a magistrate to order a defendant to carry or wear a global positioning monitoring system device as a condition of bail if the defendant was arrested for certain criminal offenses or a violation of an order of protection and the alleged offense or violation involved the strangulation or attempted strangulation of the victim or the use or threatened use of a firearm against the victim. - Amends TCA Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, relative to global positioning monitoring.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-01SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-27SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1496 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback